U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00167-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GENTRY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • October 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • October 02, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 08, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 06, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Indictment]
  • June 30, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 27, 2022: [Suppress]
  • June 21, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • June 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • June 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 10, 2022: [Status Report]
  • June 03, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 03, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • May 20, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • May 20, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • May 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 19, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 17, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • May 16, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.