U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00049
  • Case Name: LARGAN PRECISION CO., LTD. v. FISCH SIGLER, LLP
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 30, 2022: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • June 02, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 26, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • May 26, 2022: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 26, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 20, 2022: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • May 16, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • May 16, 2022: [Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.