U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROSSMAN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Exclude]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2022: [Protective Order ]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 18, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • May 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 16, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.