U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00168-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STONE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • May 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • May 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Indictment]
  • May 17, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 17, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.