U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00088
  • Case Name: Delshon Davis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
August, 2022
  • August 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • July 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Not Held]
  • July 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 (Dismissed)]
June, 2022
  • June 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • June 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order Dismiss Case (Judge)]
  • June 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (BK)]
  • June 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
May, 2022
  • May 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Show Cause Re: Post Petition Credit Counseling Cert.(4b)]
  • May 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • May 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Required Documents]
  • May 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File 121 Statement]
  • May 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Response]
  • May 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To Show Cause Re: Post Petition Credit Counseling Cert.(4b)]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order File Form 121 Statement]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order to File Required Documents]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Electronic Deficiency - Generic]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.