U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00169-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WEYER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Exclude]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Status Conference]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 07, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.