U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00090-
  • Case Name: Pandora Briggs Dubose
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Withdrawing or Subsituting Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certificate of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Not Held]
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • August 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • July 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Continued (TRUSTEE ONLY 341 Filings)]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amend/Modify]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • May 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.