U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00170-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • October 01, 2024: [Status Report]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Stipulation]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2022: [Competency Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • September 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • August 24, 2022: [Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 23, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 20, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • July 19, 2022: [Leave to File Denied]
  • July 13, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • July 13, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 21, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • June 04, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 04, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.