U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00531-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KAVZHARADZE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Criminal History Report]
  • August 10, 2022: [Criminal History Report]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Protective Order ]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 06, 2022: [.Order]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 19, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 19, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • May 18, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.