U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. OLIVERAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Response to motion]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 28, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 17, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • August 17, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 29, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • July 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 29, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • July 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 27, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • July 07, 2022: [.Order]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 19, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.