U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00172-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROJAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • July 11, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 11, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • July 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • July 11, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.