U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00173-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ARNOLD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 19, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • July 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 19, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • July 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 19, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 19, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • July 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.