U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00180-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MATTHEWS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • September 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 28, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.