U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00179-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LIPSCOMBE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 12, 2023: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 12, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 12, 2023: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 12, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 25, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.