U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00178-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MINTZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 12, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 18, 2022: [Status Conference]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • May 23, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.