U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00177-1
  • Case Name: USA v. OGLESBEE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 08, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 01, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 09, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 09, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 18, 2022: [.Order]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 03, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 03, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.