U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00176-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion pursuant to Rule 33 for New Trial]
  • October 05, 2024: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Transcript]
  • October 02, 2024: [Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 10, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 10, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • June 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.