U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00174-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SHARP
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 16, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 16, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • September 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 16, 2022: [~Util - Medical/Mental Health Alert]
  • September 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 17, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 08, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 08, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 25, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.