U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00091
  • Case Name: Santiago Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • July 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Personal Financial Managment Course]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2 (Original or Amended)]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • June 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Electronic Deficiency - Proposed Order Not Included]
  • June 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • June 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Extend/Shorten Time]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Required Documents]
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - File Matrix Verification]
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order to File Required Documents]
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order To File Matrix Verification]
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.