U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00182-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CLIFTON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 17, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 13, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Error]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • December 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Waiver]
  • October 13, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 13, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 10, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 23, 2022: [Waiver]
  • September 23, 2022: [Submission to the Court in Preparation for Upcoming Plea Hearing]
  • September 23, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 23, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 21, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • September 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Protective Order ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 25, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 01, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 03, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Standing Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.