U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00175-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FRAZIER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 12, 2023: [Probation Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 26, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 21, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 18, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 18, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 18, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [.Order]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.