U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROBINSON, SR et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • July 09, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 09, 2022: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Disclosure ]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 24, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 24, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 24, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.