U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CUFFEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 10, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 28, 2022: [Exclude]
  • July 28, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 09, 2022: [Errata]
  • June 03, 2022: [Payment of Fee- Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • June 02, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • May 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • May 25, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 24, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 24, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • May 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 24, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • May 24, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 24, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.