U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00183-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KORTE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 23, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • July 22, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 22, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 24, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 02, 2022: [Standing Order]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • May 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 24, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.