U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:07-cr-00311-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WICKS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.