U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00185-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ST CYR
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Response to motion]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • January 14, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 09, 2023: [Change Venue]
  • January 09, 2023: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • January 09, 2023: [404(b) Evidence]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 20, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 26, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.