U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BOND et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 05, 2023: [Sentencing]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Filing Trial Exhibits Introduced Into Evidence]
  • December 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Filing Trial Exhibits Introduced Into Evidence]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 23, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 23, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • September 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 17, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • August 16, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 16, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 26, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 26, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.