U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00186-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CELENTANO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 20, 2023: [Response to motion]
  • January 10, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 29, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • October 21, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • October 06, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • September 09, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • September 09, 2022: [Bill of Particulars ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 07, 2022: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
  • July 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 02, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.