U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:03-cr-00275-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SMALLWOOD, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expunge]
  • July 09, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 26, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 26, 2022: [Expunge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.