U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WATTS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 23, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • June 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Placement in High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 30, 2022: [Placement in High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • May 30, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 27, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.