U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00184-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RAMEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response to motion]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Change Venue]
November, 2022
  • November 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2022: [.Order]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Response to motion]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 18, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • August 16, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • August 16, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • August 15, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • July 19, 2022: [Status Report]
  • July 13, 2022: [Response to motion]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Revoke]
  • June 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 15, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 15, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.