U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00189-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GABLE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 17, 2023: [Sentencing]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • December 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 23, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 23, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 03, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 31, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 31, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 26, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • May 26, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 26, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.