U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HONESTY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 01, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Arrest ]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.