U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RICE, ET AL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 05, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 09, 2025: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 12, 2025: [Probation Order]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 04, 2024: [.Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [Re-entry Progress Hearing]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Status Report]
  • January 22, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Suppress]
  • January 19, 2023: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 19, 2023: [Bond Set/Reset]
  • January 17, 2023: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • January 12, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 11, 2023: [Information - Felony]
  • January 11, 2023: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 11, 2023: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 11, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 11, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 11, 2023: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 10, 2023: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 10, 2023: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 10, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 10, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 10, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Error]
  • January 09, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 07, 2023: [Receipt ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Exclude]
  • January 04, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • December 30, 2022: [Suppress]
  • December 29, 2022: [Suppress]
  • December 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 23, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 23, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 23, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 22, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 21, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 21, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 21, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 21, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • December 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 15, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 12, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 02, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 02, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 02, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 02, 2022: [Information - Felony]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 09, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • November 09, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • November 08, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 08, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 08, 2022: [Sentencing Guidelines]
  • November 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 08, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • November 03, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • November 03, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • November 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Vacate]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 28, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 28, 2022: [Factual Proffer]
  • October 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 28, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 26, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • October 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 14, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • October 14, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • October 12, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 07, 2022: [Transcript]
  • October 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 05, 2022: [Criminal History Report]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 03, 2022: [Sentencing Guidelines]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 20, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 18, 2022: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • September 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Medical/Mental Health Alert]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 13, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 13, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Criminal History Report]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 28, 2022: [Bond ]
  • August 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 26, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • August 26, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 24, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Criminal History Report]
  • August 23, 2022: [Bond ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Criminal History Report]
  • August 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • August 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Placement in High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 19, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Placement in High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • August 19, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • August 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 19, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 19, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • August 19, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Case]
  • August 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 03, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 02, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 01, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 01, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 29, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 28, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 28, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 28, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 28, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • July 27, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 25, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • July 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Exclude]
  • July 19, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 19, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 18, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • July 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • July 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 14, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 14, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 13, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 13, 2022: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Case]
  • July 12, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • July 11, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 11, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • July 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • July 09, 2022: [Bond ]
  • July 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 05, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 05, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 05, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 05, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • July 05, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 05, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • July 05, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • July 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 01, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Arrest ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 30, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 30, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 30, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 29, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 28, 2022: [Indictment]
  • June 28, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • June 28, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Vacate]
  • June 27, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 24, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review]
  • June 22, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Review]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 22, 2022: [Stay]
  • June 21, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • June 17, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • June 14, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Stay]
  • June 13, 2022: [Review]
  • June 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 12, 2022: [Stay]
  • June 08, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 07, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 07, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 03, 2022: [Attorney Appearance Pro Bono]
  • June 03, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 03, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 31, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 31, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 31, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 27, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • May 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 27, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • May 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 27, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 27, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.