U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON, Jr.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 10, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 06, 2022: [.Order]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 27, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.