U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00190-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MADRID-FLORES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Supplemental Record Sent USCA]
October, 2024
  • October 12, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 11, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • October 08, 2024: [Leave to File Denied]
  • October 06, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Error]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 05, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 04, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Exclude]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 27, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 27, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 27, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 27, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.