U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00192-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HORVATH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • November 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2022: [Travel ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • August 12, 2022: [Submission to the Court in Preparation for Upcoming Plea Hearing]
  • August 12, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 12, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • August 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 07, 2022: [.Order]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Standing Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.