U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00195-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HALL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Re-entry Progress Hearing]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 19, 2023: [Bond Set/Reset]
  • January 10, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 23, 2022: [Bond ]
  • November 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 08, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 08, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Protective Order ]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • July 05, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 01, 2022: [Review]
  • July 01, 2022: [Stay]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 29, 2022: [Stay]
  • June 29, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 16, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 01, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.