U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00196-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KAMARA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 13, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 13, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 11, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 11, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • December 07, 2022: [Information - Felony]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 23, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Exclude]
  • November 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 16, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 13, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 08, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 02, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 01, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.