U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HUESO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 01, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 01, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.