U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00194-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FERGUSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 04, 2023: [Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Sentencing]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Leave to File Denied]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 06, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • July 06, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 06, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order directing action by Probation Office]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.