U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00121-2
  • Case Name: USA v. CASTLE et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 18, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 18, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 08, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 02, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 02, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.