U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00054
  • Case Name: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION v. MATCH GROUP, INC.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • August 22, 2022: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • August 15, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • August 11, 2022: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 10, 2022: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 03, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 28, 2022: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • July 21, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • July 20, 2022: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • July 18, 2022: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • July 12, 2022: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • July 08, 2022: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • July 05, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 08, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 08, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • June 07, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 02, 2022: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • June 02, 2022: [Enforce]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.