U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00052
  • Case Name: APPLICATION OF YI CHEN FOR ACCESS TO THE NAMES OF JURORS EMPANELED IN UNITED STATES V. WANG et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Response to motion]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule]
  • June 03, 2022: [Briefing Schedule]
  • June 03, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 02, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.