U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00198-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MILSTREED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 08, 2022: [Exclude]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Bond Set/Reset]
  • June 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 23, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 02, 2022: [Indictment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.