U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00197-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SHOUGH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 08, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • August 16, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 16, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 15, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 15, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 02, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.