U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00201-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SHELTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 09, 2024: [.Order]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 07, 2022: [Suppress]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • August 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Indictment]
  • August 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 05, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 05, 2022: [.Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Exclude]
  • July 05, 2022: [Vacate]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 17, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • June 14, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 13, 2022: [Vacate]
  • June 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.