U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00200-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NAVARRO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Reconsideration ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Compel]
  • January 24, 2023: [Hearing ]
  • January 23, 2023: [In Limine ]
  • January 21, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 02, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • October 12, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • September 09, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • September 09, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • September 09, 2022: [Appear]
  • September 09, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 07, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 31, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 31, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 24, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 23, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 17, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • August 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 12, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 04, 2022: [Compel]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 14, 2022: [Modify]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • June 10, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 10, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 09, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • June 08, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 08, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 06, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 06, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • June 03, 2022: [Seal Case]
  • June 03, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.