U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00199-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SMITH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [.Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 10, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • June 09, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 06, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 06, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • June 03, 2022: [Seal Case]
  • June 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.