U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00205-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JONES et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Exclude]
  • December 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 20, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Status Conference]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 28, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 06, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.